Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/28/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/25/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/28/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/28/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/15/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/20/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/21/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/26/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/29/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/26/1994