Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/07/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/07/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/07/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/07/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/24/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/22/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/22/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/24/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/21/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/04/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/07/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/14/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 09/14/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/27/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/13/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/25/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/27/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/27/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/29/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 11/02/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/25/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/25/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 01/26/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 01/31/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/31/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/02/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/08/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/08/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/22/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/22/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/22/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/22/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/22/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/22/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/25/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/25/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/25/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/13/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/13/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/13/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/23/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/01/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 08/05/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/27/1994