Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/24/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/24/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/24/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/07/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/07/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/07/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/07/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/07/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/07/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/15/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/30/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/13/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/13/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/13/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/20/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/20/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/20/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/23/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/23/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/03/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/03/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/05/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/05/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/21/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/21/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/21/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/21/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/21/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/21/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/23/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/23/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/30/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/30/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/30/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/30/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/14/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/14/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/14/1993