Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 05/18/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/27/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/27/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/27/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/27/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/08/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/08/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/08/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/08/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/15/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/15/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/15/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/15/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/22/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/22/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/22/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/22/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/22/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/13/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/13/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/14/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/14/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/14/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/14/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/14/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/14/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/21/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/28/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/28/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/28/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/28/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/28/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/28/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/28/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/30/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/30/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/03/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/04/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 08/04/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/10/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/10/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/13/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/13/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/13/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/13/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/13/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/13/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/13/1993