Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
09/21/1993 Became Public Law No: 103-84.
09/21/1993 Signed by President.
09/21/1993 Presented to President.
09/14/1993 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/14/1993 Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
07/23/1993 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S9364-9365)
07/22/1993 Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/19/1993 Introduced in Senate