Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/19/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/19/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/27/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/27/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/10/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/10/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/10/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/10/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/10/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/10/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/10/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/10/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/10/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/10/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/10/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/10/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/10/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/10/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/10/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/10/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/10/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/10/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/23/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/23/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/23/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/23/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/23/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/23/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/23/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/23/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/23/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/14/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/14/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/14/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/14/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/14/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/14/1993