Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/26/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/15/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/22/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/19/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/19/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/19/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/19/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/19/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 10/19/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/19/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/19/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/19/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/19/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/20/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/20/1993