Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 06/08/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/09/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/15/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/15/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/15/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/15/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/15/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/22/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/22/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/22/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/22/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/22/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/24/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/29/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/29/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/29/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/30/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/30/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/30/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/30/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/01/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/01/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/01/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/01/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/13/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/13/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/13/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/13/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/13/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/13/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/13/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/13/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/14/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/14/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/14/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/15/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/15/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/20/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/20/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/20/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/20/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/20/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/21/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/22/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/30/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/30/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/30/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew