Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/16/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 11/16/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/16/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/16/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/16/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/19/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 11/22/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/14/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/14/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/14/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/21/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/26/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/26/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/26/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 05/03/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/03/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/03/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/03/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/03/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/04/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/04/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/11/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/11/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/11/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/16/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/16/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/16/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 05/16/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/16/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 05/16/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/19/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/19/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/19/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/19/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/25/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/25/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/25/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/25/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/08/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/14/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/14/1994