Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/14/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/14/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 07/14/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/04/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 08/10/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 08/13/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 08/25/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/26/1994