Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/26/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/28/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 01/28/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 01/28/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 01/28/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/28/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 01/28/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/02/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/02/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/02/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/02/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/03/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/03/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/16/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/16/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/16/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/16/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/16/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/16/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/17/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/24/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/25/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/10/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/17/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/18/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/19/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/19/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/23/1994