Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 02/04/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/16/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/24/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/24/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/03/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/03/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/17/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/01/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/20/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/15/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/20/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 01/25/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/31/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/07/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/03/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/25/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/20/1994