Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/16/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/16/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/16/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/24/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/24/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/04/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/09/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/09/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/09/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/09/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/09/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/09/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/09/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 03/09/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/09/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/16/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/16/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/16/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/16/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/16/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/26/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/26/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/26/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/26/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/26/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/02/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/27/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 08/04/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/04/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/04/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 08/04/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/04/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/04/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 08/04/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/04/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 08/05/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/15/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/04/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/06/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/06/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/25/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew