Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/21/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/21/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 02/23/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/23/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/24/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/06/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/06/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/06/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/06/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/06/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/06/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/14/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/14/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/14/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/14/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/23/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/23/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/05/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/01/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/02/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/06/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/16/1996