Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/23/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/24/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/14/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/28/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/28/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/03/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/23/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/20/1995