Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/03/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/03/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/03/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/03/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/09/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/09/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/09/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/14/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/22/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/22/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/22/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/22/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/22/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/22/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/22/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/22/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/22/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/23/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/04/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/04/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/04/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/04/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/04/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/04/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/04/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/04/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/04/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/04/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/04/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 04/07/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/07/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/07/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/07/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/07/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/07/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/07/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/07/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/07/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/07/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/07/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/07/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/07/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/07/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/07/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/11/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/11/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/11/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/11/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/11/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/11/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/11/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/11/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/18/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/18/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/18/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/18/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/18/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/18/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/18/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/07/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/07/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/07/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/07/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/08/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/15/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/15/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/15/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/15/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/15/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/15/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/27/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/27/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/12/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/12/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/12/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/12/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/18/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/18/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/18/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/26/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/26/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/26/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/26/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/26/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/26/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/26/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/04/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 09/20/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/20/1995