Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/23/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/23/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/06/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/08/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/14/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/01/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/01/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/01/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/02/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/12/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/17/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/20/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/10/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/13/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/17/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/06/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/06/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/12/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/28/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/26/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 12/13/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/20/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/20/1996