Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/11/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/11/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/11/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/20/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/20/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/20/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/23/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/23/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/26/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/27/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/30/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/01/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/01/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/06/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/06/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/08/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/09/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/10/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/23/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/01/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/03/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/03/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/06/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/08/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/10/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/22/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 04/05/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/18/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/22/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/24/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/06/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/20/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/20/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/20/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/22/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/28/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/11/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/11/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/17/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/20/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/14/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/14/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/21/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/21/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/06/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/06/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 10/06/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/17/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 11/17/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/20/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/28/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/29/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 12/05/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/06/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/20/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/29/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/10/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/17/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/18/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/1996