Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/14/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/14/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/16/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/16/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/22/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/24/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/24/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/21/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/21/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/28/1996