Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/24/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/24/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/10/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/10/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/10/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/10/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/10/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/10/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/10/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/21/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/04/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/12/1995