Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 02/24/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/24/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/01/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/15/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/15/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/10/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/10/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/15/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/15/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/15/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/11/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/07/1995