There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Omnibus Adoption Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish grant programs and provide other forms of Federal assistance to pregnant women, children in need of adoptive families, and individuals and families adopting children.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date
03/17/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
Action By: Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities
03/13/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/13/1995See H.R.1215.
03/10/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
03/06/1995Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
03/06/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on National Security
03/03/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
03/02/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
03/02/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/27/1995Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to House Economic and Educational
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to House National Security
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Referred to the Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities, and in addition to the Committees on National Security, Banking and Financial Services, Ways and Means, Commerce, Government Reform and Oversight, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E451-452)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House National Security02/27/1995 Referred to
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/06/1995 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services02/27/1995 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity03/10/1995 Referred to
House Economic and Educational Opportunities02/27/1995 Referred to
House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families03/17/1995 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight02/27/1995 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service03/02/1995 Referred to
House Commerce02/27/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/03/1995 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/27/1995 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation03/13/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/27/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources03/02/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1066. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/1995)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: National Advisory Board on Adoption

Title II: Adoption Data Collection System

Title III: Adoption Education Programs

Title IV: Adoption Benefits for Federal Employees and

Military Personnel

Title V: Adoption Tax Credit

Title VI: Maternal Health Certificates Program

Title VII: Rehabilitation Grants for Maternity Housing and

Services Facilities

Title VIII: Sense of Congress Regarding Changes in State

Adoption Laws

Omnibus Adoption Act of 1995 - Title I: National Advisory Board on Adoption - Establishes the National Advisory Board on Adoption to monitor program implementation under this Act and make recommendations to the Congress.

Title II: Adoption Data Collection System - Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (the Secretary) to submit a status report to the Congress on implementation of a certain data collection system required under the Social Security Act.

Title III: Adoption Education Programs - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to direct the Secretary of Education to award social work graduate school fellowships for work in innovative programs on the effects of adoption on the parties involved. Authorizes appropriations.

Directs the Secretary of Education to award grants to the States for implementation of adoption education programs. Authorizes appropriations.

Title IV: Adoption Benefits for Federal Employees and Military Personnel - Amends Federal law to set forth adoption benefits for Federal employees and military personnel. Directs the Director of the Office of Personnel Management, the Secretary of Defense, and the Secretary of Transportation to coordinate their efforts in implementing this Act and to consult with the National Advisory Board on Adoption.

Title V: Adoption Tax Credit - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow adoption expenses as a credit against the individual income tax. Requires married couples to file jointly in order to receive such credit.

Title VI: Maternal Health Certificates Program - Directs the Secretary to establish a maternal health certificates program to cover maternity and housing services facility expenses incurred by eligible pregnant women. Authorizes appropriations.

Title VII: Rehabilitation Grants for Maternity Housing and Services Facilities - Directs the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to implement a grant program to assist eligible nonprofit entities to rehabilitate buildings for use as housing and services facilities for eligible pregnant women. Authorizes appropriations.

Title VIII: Sense of Congress Regarding Changes in State Adoption Laws - Expresses the sense of the Congress that the States should adopt a specified statutory adoption scheme, including certain health plan benefits.