Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/02/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/02/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/02/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/07/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/07/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/07/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/07/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/09/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/09/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/09/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/16/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/02/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/25/1995