Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/11/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/11/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/17/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/17/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/17/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/17/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/17/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/17/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/19/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/19/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/19/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/19/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/23/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/23/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 01/23/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/23/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/23/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 01/23/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/26/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/26/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/26/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/31/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/31/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/03/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/03/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/03/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/03/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/03/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/14/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/14/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/22/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/22/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/22/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/01/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/01/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/07/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/07/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/09/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/12/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/17/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/24/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/07/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/21/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/21/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/29/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/11/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/13/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/21/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/28/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/28/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/28/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/28/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/28/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/02/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/02/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 08/02/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/02/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/13/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/07/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 11/07/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/07/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/07/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/08/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/08/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/08/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/08/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/15/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/15/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/15/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/15/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 11/15/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/15/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 11/15/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 12/06/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 12/06/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/13/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/23/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/29/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/07/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/1996