Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/01/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/13/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/15/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/20/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/22/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/22/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/22/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/26/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/17/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/30/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/08/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/08/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/08/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/12/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/12/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/16/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/16/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/25/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/29/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/02/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 08/02/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/02/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/02/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/04/1996
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/04/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/09/1996