Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/06/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/08/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/16/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/16/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/16/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/16/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/16/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/16/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/16/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/16/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/16/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/22/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/22/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/22/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/30/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/30/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/30/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/30/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/30/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/30/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/05/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/05/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/05/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/05/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/02/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/02/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/09/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/09/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/09/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/16/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/16/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/16/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/16/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 05/25/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/08/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/08/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/13/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/13/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/13/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/16/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/16/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/20/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/27/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/27/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/27/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/28/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/28/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/11/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/12/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/12/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/12/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/13/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/20/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/20/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/28/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/28/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/28/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 08/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/08/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/08/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/08/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 09/08/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/08/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/08/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/08/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/08/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/08/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/13/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/13/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/19/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/19/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/29/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/11/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/12/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew