Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/03/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/06/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/06/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/06/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/06/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/10/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/10/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/10/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/10/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/10/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/10/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/14/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/14/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/14/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/14/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/14/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/14/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/14/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/14/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/23/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/23/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/28/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/28/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/28/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/29/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/29/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/09/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/17/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/22/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/23/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/06/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/13/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/13/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/15/1995