Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/02/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 03/02/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/09/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/09/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/21/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/01/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/01/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/23/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew