Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/03/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 03/03/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/03/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/10/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/10/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/06/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/06/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/06/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/19/1995