Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/16/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/16/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/16/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/16/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/16/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/05/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/05/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/05/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/13/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/13/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/20/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/20/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 07/24/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/24/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/24/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/24/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/24/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/24/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/24/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/25/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/25/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/25/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/25/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/25/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/25/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/28/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/28/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/28/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/01/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 08/01/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/01/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/01/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 08/01/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/01/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/12/1995