Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/13/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/13/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/13/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/24/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/24/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/15/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/15/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/13/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/13/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/28/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/17/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/17/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/17/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/17/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 10/17/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/17/1995