Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/24/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/24/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/24/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/24/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/24/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/24/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/30/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 03/30/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/30/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/30/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/30/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/30/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/30/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/07/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/07/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/07/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/07/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/07/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/02/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/02/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/02/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/02/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/02/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/02/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/02/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/16/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/16/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/16/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/16/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/25/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/25/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/08/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/08/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/08/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/08/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/16/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/16/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 06/16/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/16/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/21/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/11/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/11/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/11/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/11/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/13/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/13/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/28/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 08/01/1995