Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/08/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/28/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/28/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/28/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/28/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/28/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/28/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/28/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/28/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/28/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/28/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/10/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/15/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/15/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/15/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/15/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/15/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/15/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/15/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/15/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/22/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/27/1995