Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/11/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/11/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/11/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/11/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/20/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/20/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/20/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/20/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/20/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/27/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/27/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/27/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/15/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/15/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/15/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/15/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/21/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/23/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/30/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 12/21/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/16/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/12/1996