Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/09/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 03/09/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/09/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/24/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/24/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/24/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/24/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/24/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/24/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/24/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/24/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/24/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/05/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/05/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/05/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/20/1995