There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Captive Exotic Animal Protection Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit interstate-connected conduct relating to exotic animals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/10/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/25/1996Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
04/24/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/10/1995Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/10/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/21/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/21/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/23/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/03/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/03/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/03/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/03/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/03/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/02/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/02/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/11/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/11/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/11/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/11/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/11/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/06/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/06/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/06/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/06/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/17/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/17/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/17/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/17/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/04/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/04/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/10/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/10/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/10/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/17/1995
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/17/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 10/26/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/26/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/26/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/01/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/01/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/01/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/01/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/14/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/14/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/29/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/29/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/29/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/29/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/29/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/29/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/29/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 12/04/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 12/04/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 12/04/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/18/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/18/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/04/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/04/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/31/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/29/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/17/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/17/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/17/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/23/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/24/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 06/06/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/1996
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 07/17/1995 02/29/1996 --
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/1995 03/22/1996 --
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/26/1996 04/16/1996 --
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/20/1995 04/24/1996 --
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/12/1995 04/25/1996 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/10/1995 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime04/24/1995 Referred to
04/25/1996 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1202. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/1995)

Captive Exotic Animal Protection Act of 1995 - Amends the Federal criminal code to prohibit and set penalties for knowingly transferring, transporting, or possessing a confined exotic animal for purposes of allowing the killing or injuring of that animal for entertainment or the collection of a trophy.