Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/09/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/23/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/23/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/23/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/23/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 06/08/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/08/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/16/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/16/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/16/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/16/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/16/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/18/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/28/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/08/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/08/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/28/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 10/11/1995