There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Student Loan Affordability Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a deduction for the payment of interest on student loans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/14/1995Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E592)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/24/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/24/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/24/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/24/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/28/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/28/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/04/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/04/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/04/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/09/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/09/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/17/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/23/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/06/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/06/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 06/08/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/14/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/20/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/13/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/19/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/05/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/14/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1229.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1229. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/1995)

Student Loan Affordability Act of 1995 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a tax deduction for the interest paid on qualified higher education loans. Allows such deduction in computing adjusted gross income.