Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/20/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/20/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/20/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/20/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/20/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/20/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/20/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/20/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/20/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/20/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/20/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 01/20/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 01/20/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 01/20/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/20/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/20/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/20/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/20/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/20/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/20/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/20/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/20/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/20/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/20/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/24/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/24/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/02/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/02/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/02/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/02/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/02/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/02/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/02/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/02/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/02/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/02/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/02/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/02/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/02/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/02/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/02/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/02/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/02/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/02/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/02/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/02/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/14/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/14/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/14/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/14/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/14/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/08/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/08/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/08/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/08/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/08/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/08/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/08/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/08/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/21/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/21/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/11/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/11/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/11/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/11/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/11/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/11/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/11/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/11/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/18/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/18/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/26/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/06/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/06/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/06/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/06/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/19/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/19/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/18/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/18/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/07/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/18/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/05/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/05/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 04/25/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/08/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/13/1996