Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/14/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/14/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/01/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/01/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/02/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/02/1995