Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/16/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/16/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/22/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/22/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/22/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/22/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/22/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/22/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/22/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/22/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/22/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/22/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/29/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/29/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/29/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/29/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/29/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/29/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/29/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/29/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 04/05/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/05/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/05/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/05/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/07/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/07/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/07/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/24/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/14/1995