Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/17/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/20/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/20/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 01/20/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/31/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/31/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/31/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 01/31/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/15/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/15/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/22/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/22/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 04/05/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/16/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/16/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/21/1996