Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/04/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/13/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/13/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/13/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/22/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/13/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/13/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/13/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/13/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/12/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/12/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/12/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/12/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/12/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/12/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/09/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/09/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/09/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/09/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/09/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 12/15/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/15/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 12/15/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/15/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/15/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/29/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/22/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/22/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 04/24/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/21/1996