Committees: H.R.1296 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources03/22/1995 Referred to
07/12/1995 Markup by
08/04/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-234
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands03/27/1995 Referred to
05/16/1995 Hearings by
06/27/1995 Markup by
06/27/1995 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/20/1995 Referred to
12/20/1995 Hearings by
12/21/1995 Markup by
12/22/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-202
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation09/21/1995 Referred to