Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/20/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/20/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/20/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/20/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/20/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/20/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/23/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/23/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/13/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 11/17/1995