Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/29/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/02/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/02/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/02/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/02/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/02/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/17/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/17/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/17/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/17/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/17/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/17/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/17/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 05/17/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/17/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/17/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/17/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/17/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/24/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/24/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/14/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/14/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/14/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/14/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/14/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/14/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/14/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/14/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/14/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/14/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 07/17/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/17/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/13/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/13/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/07/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/23/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/23/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/13/1996