Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/30/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/30/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/09/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/09/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/15/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/15/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/15/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/07/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/07/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/07/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/07/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/22/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/22/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/17/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/17/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/17/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/1995