Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 03/30/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/30/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/30/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/11/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/18/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/18/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/11/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/16/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/20/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 11/30/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/23/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/27/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/27/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/27/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/27/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/28/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/28/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/25/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/25/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/11/1996