There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize States to deny public education benefits to aliens not lawfully present in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/03/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
11/01/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S16508)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/24/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/03/1995Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/03/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/06/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/06/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/08/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/10/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 12/14/1995

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary04/03/1995 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims04/24/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1377.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1377. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/03/1995)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to: (1) declare it to be U.S. policy that illegal aliens not be entitled to public education benefits in the same manner as U.S. citizens and lawful resident aliens; and (2) authorize States to deny public education benefits to illegal aliens.