Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/03/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/03/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/06/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/06/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/08/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/10/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 12/14/1995